01/01/1927 |
Drafted in the 1927 inaugural draft by the Arizona Diamondbacks. (Round 18, Pick 13, 268th overall pick). |
04/07/1927 |
Named the #82 prospect in the FRBA |
07/28/1927 |
Was traded by the Arizona Diamondbacks to the Brooklyn Dodgers, along with RP Miguel Arroyo, in exchange for LF Mike Antonelli. |
08/08/1927 |
Wins the R OWC Player of the Week Award. |
11/12/1927 |
Was traded by the Brooklyn Dodgers to the Colorado Rockies, along with C Jesse Gutierrez and LF Mario Jimenez, in exchange for SP Brett Wright. |
01/01/1928 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 20 (47); Power: 21 (50); Eye: 2 (30). |
08/08/1928 |
Was selected to the 1928 Sunset League All-Star Game. |
08/13/1928 |
Wins the R OWC Player of the Week Award. |
01/01/1929 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 21 (44); Power: 20 (46); Eye: 2 (29). |
01/01/1930 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 24 (42); Power: 27 (47); Eye: 8 (28). |
07/28/1930 |
Wins the S A WC Player of the Week Award. |
01/01/1931 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (40); Power: 30 (46); Eye: 11 (29). |
07/22/1931 |
Injured (flu-like symptoms),day-to-day for 2 days. |
07/27/1931 |
Wins the S A WC Player of the Week Award. |
07/27/1931 |
Goes 0-4 against the Kannapolis Cannon Ballers, ending his hitting streak at 21 games. |
01/01/1932 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (41); Power: 40 (49); Eye: 22 (31). |
04/05/1932 |
Unsuccessfully completed training to improve his defense at first base at the Colorado Rockies development complex. |
01/01/1933 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (40); Power: 40 (47); Eye: 22 (31). |
06/08/1933 |
Released by the Colorado organization. |
06/20/1933 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Kansas City Blues organization. |
08/07/1933 |
Was selected to the 1933 Colonial League All-Star Game. |
11/10/1933 |
Signed a minor league contract extension with the New York Yankees organization. |
01/01/1934 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (38); Power: 40 (47); Eye: 22 (29). |
06/26/1934 |
Released by the New York organization. |
07/03/1934 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Tennessee Smokies organization. |
10/03/1934 |
Released by the Chicago organization. |
01/01/1935 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (37); Power: 42 (47); Eye: 26 (30). |
04/27/1935 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Tulsa Drillers organization. |
08/07/1935 |
Released by the Brooklyn organization. |
08/24/1935 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the San Antonio Missions organization. |
11/08/1935 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1936 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (36); Power: 45 (47); Eye: 25 (29). |
05/04/1936 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Dayton Dragons organization. |
08/05/1936 |
Released by the Cincinnati organization. |
08/20/1936 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Tulsa Drillers organization. |
11/14/1936 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1937 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (35); Power: 45 (47); Eye: 26 (28). |
06/06/1937 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Tulsa Drillers organization. |
09/06/1937 |
Released by the Brooklyn organization. |
01/01/1938 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (34); Power: 45 (46); Eye: 26 (27). |
10/18/1938 |
Retired from professional baseball. |