01/01/1927 |
Drafted in the 1927 inaugural draft by the Arizona Diamondbacks. (Round 24, Pick 13, 358th overall pick). |
07/28/1927 |
Was traded by the Arizona Diamondbacks to the Brooklyn Dodgers, along with 1B Pat Caron, in exchange for LF Mike Antonelli. |
11/12/1927 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1928 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 61 (61); Movement: 47 (47); Control: 46 (46). |
01/01/1928 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 61 (61); Movement: 47 (47); Control: 46 (46). |
01/30/1928 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $15,400 with the Los Angeles Angels organization. |
03/18/1928 |
Injured (hamstring soreness),day-to-day for one week. |
04/08/1928 |
Injured (mild abdominal strain),day-to-day for one week. |
11/08/1928 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1929 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 49 (49); Movement: 52 (52); Control: 47 (47). |
01/01/1929 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 49 (49); Movement: 52 (52); Control: 47 (47). |
01/14/1929 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $15,400 with the Arizona Diamondbacks organization. |
07/29/1929 |
Was traded by the Arizona Diamondbacks to the Baltimore Orioles in exchange for 1B Omar Garciz. |
11/07/1929 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1930 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 39 (39); Movement: 55 (55); Control: 46 (46). |
01/01/1930 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 39 (39); Movement: 55 (55); Control: 46 (46). |
02/01/1930 |
Signed a minor league contract with majors option with the Chicago Cubs organization. |
07/19/1930 |
Was traded by the Chicago Cubs to the Kansas City Athletics, along with RF Matt Newsome, in exchange for C Mark Graham and C Sam Trent. |
11/09/1930 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1931 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 38 (38); Movement: 55 (55); Control: 47 (47). |
01/01/1931 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 38 (38); Movement: 55 (55); Control: 47 (47). |
02/09/1931 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Los Angeles Angels organization. |
04/08/1931 |
Injured (allergic reaction),out for 2 days. |
10/21/1931 |
Retired from professional baseball. |