06/05/1942 |
Drafted in the 1942 first-year player draft by the Seattle Pilots. (Round 2, Pick 3, 20th overall pick). |
06/29/1942 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Seattle Pilots organization with a signing bonus of $4,830. |
01/01/1943 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 59 (67); Power: 21 (37); Eye: 50 (57). |
08/09/1943 |
Was selected to the 1943 Colonial League All-Star Game. |
01/01/1944 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 44 (47); Power: 23 (30); Eye: 44 (46). |
07/13/1944 |
Released by the Seattle organization. |
07/26/1944 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Fort Wayne Wizards organization. |
01/01/1945 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 43 (45); Power: 22 (27); Eye: 44 (45). |
07/11/1945 |
Released by the San Diego organization. |
07/19/1945 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Cleveland Naps organization. |
10/01/1945 |
Wins the 1945 Interstate League League Championship with the Akron Rubberducks! |
01/01/1946 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 42 (43); Power: 24 (26); Eye: 43 (44). |
05/07/1946 |
Released by the Cleveland organization. |
06/08/1946 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Houston Colt 45 s organization. |
09/07/1946 |
Injured (back tightness),day-to-day for 2 days. |
10/09/1946 |
Released by the Houston organization. |
01/01/1947 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 41 (42); Power: 23 (23); Eye: 41 (42). |
01/24/1947 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Seattle Pilots organization. |
05/02/1947 |
Released by the Seattle organization. |
06/24/1947 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Rocky Mountain Vibes organization. |
09/28/1947 |
Released by the Colorado organization. |
11/10/1947 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Brooklyn Dodgers organization. |
01/01/1948 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 42 (43); Power: 23 (23); Eye: 41 (42). |
03/08/1948 |
Released by the Brooklyn Dodgers. |
03/08/1948 |
Released by the Brooklyn Dodgers. |
10/25/1948 |
Retired from professional baseball. |