01/01/1927 |
Drafted in the 1927 inaugural draft by the Cleveland Naps. (Round 8, Pick 12, 117th overall pick). |
04/16/1927 |
Injured (mild shoulder strain),day-to-day for 2 weeks. |
07/11/1927 |
Injured (knee soreness),day-to-day for one week. |
11/12/1927 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1928 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 64 (64); Power: 54 (54); Eye: 60 (60). |
01/23/1928 |
Signed a 5-year contract worth a total of $350,000 with the Philadelphia Phillies organization. |
04/03/1928 |
Successfully completed training to improve his defense at left field at the Philadelphia Phillies development complex. |
05/07/1928 |
Wins the FRBA AL Player of the Week Award. |
05/12/1928 |
Injured (oblique strain),out for 4 weeks. |
06/15/1928 |
Injured (shoulder subluxation),day-to-day for one week. |
07/11/1928 |
Was selected to the 1928 Frozen Rope Baseball Association All-Star Game. |
07/17/1928 |
Injured (strained rib cage muscle),day-to-day for 4 weeks. |
08/10/1928 |
Injured (mild oblique strain),day-to-day for 4 days. |
08/28/1928 |
Injured (oblique strain),out for one week. |
09/10/1928 |
Injured (biceps tendinitis),out for 4 weeks. |
01/01/1929 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 65 (65); Power: 56 (56); Eye: 59 (59). |
04/02/1929 |
Successfully completed training to improve his baserunning fundamentals at the Philadelphia Phillies development complex. |
04/15/1929 |
Injured (blurred vision),day-to-day for 1 day. |
07/10/1929 |
Was selected to the 1929 Frozen Rope Baseball Association All-Star Game. |
01/01/1930 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 61 (61); Power: 56 (56); Eye: 61 (61). |
09/12/1930 |
Injured (bruised thumb),day-to-day for 4 days. |
11/11/1930 |
Was traded by the Philadelphia Phillies to the Milwaukee Braves, along with SS Tom Britt, in exchange for C Joe Ayers. |
01/01/1931 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 61 (61); Power: 51 (51); Eye: 59 (59). |
01/01/1932 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 58 (58); Power: 49 (49); Eye: 52 (52). |
11/09/1932 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1933 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 53 (53); Power: 49 (49); Eye: 50 (50). |
10/18/1933 |
Retired from professional baseball. |