06/05/1940 |
Drafted in the 1940 first-year player draft by the Brooklyn Dodgers. (Round 10, Pick 11, 158th overall pick). |
01/01/1941 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 43 (44); Movement: 43 (49); Control: 34 (34). |
01/01/1941 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 43 (44); Movement: 43 (49); Control: 34 (34). |
01/01/1942 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 43 (43); Movement: 46 (49); Control: 34 (34). |
01/01/1942 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 43 (43); Movement: 46 (49); Control: 34 (34). |
04/21/1942 |
Released by the Brooklyn organization. |
06/17/1942 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Clearwater Threshers organization. |
09/20/1942 |
Released by the Philadelphia organization. |
01/01/1943 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (42); Movement: 46 (47); Control: 31 (31). |
01/01/1943 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (42); Movement: 46 (47); Control: 31 (31). |
01/01/1944 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (42); Movement: 44 (46); Control: 27 (27). |
01/01/1944 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (42); Movement: 44 (46); Control: 27 (27). |
02/07/1944 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Milwaukee Braves organization. |
05/07/1944 |
Released by the Milwaukee organization. |
11/18/1944 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Arizona Diamondbacks organization. |
01/01/1945 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (42); Movement: 43 (46); Control: 26 (26). |
01/01/1945 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (42); Movement: 43 (46); Control: 26 (26). |
02/16/1945 |
Released by the Arizona organization. |
11/09/1945 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Houston Colt 45 s organization. |
01/01/1946 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (42); Movement: 42 (44); Control: 25 (25). |
01/01/1946 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (42); Movement: 42 (44); Control: 25 (25). |
02/19/1946 |
Released by the Houston organization. |
10/17/1946 |
Retired from professional baseball. |