06/05/1938 |
Drafted in the 1938 first-year player draft out of college (Harford CC; Bel Air, MD) by the Cincinnati Reds. (Round 15, Pick 11, 236th overall pick). |
01/01/1939 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (50); Power: 26 (45); Eye: 21 (37). |
07/25/1939 |
Was traded by the Cincinnati Reds to the Brooklyn Dodgers, along with RP Jesse McAleer, in exchange for 1B Josh Lawless. |
01/01/1940 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (48); Power: 31 (45); Eye: 22 (35). |
06/09/1940 |
Injured (sprained elbow),day-to-day for 2 weeks. |
07/30/1940 |
Injured (bruised foot),day-to-day for one week. |
08/20/1940 |
Injured (back tightness),day-to-day for 4 days. |
01/01/1941 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (45); Power: 32 (43); Eye: 24 (34). |
07/07/1941 |
Released by the Brooklyn organization. |
07/07/1941 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Lexington Legends organization. |
10/09/1941 |
Released by the Houston organization. |
01/01/1942 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (41); Power: 33 (42); Eye: 24 (33). |
09/16/1942 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Fort Wayne Wizards organization. |
01/01/1943 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (39); Power: 31 (39); Eye: 25 (32). |
05/25/1943 |
Released by the San Diego organization. |
01/01/1944 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (37); Power: 30 (36); Eye: 25 (31). |
01/01/1945 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (35); Power: 29 (34); Eye: 26 (30). |
09/04/1945 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Lexington Legends organization. |
11/09/1945 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1946 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (34); Power: 30 (34); Eye: 26 (29). |
01/01/1947 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 30 (32); Eye: 27 (28). |
10/11/1947 |
Retired from professional baseball. |