06/05/1938 |
Drafted in the 1938 first-year player draft out of college (University of California; Berkeley, CA) by the Kansas City Athletics. (Round 10, Pick 2, 147th overall pick). |
12/22/1938 |
Was traded by the Kansas City Athletics to the Cleveland Naps, along with LF Karl Betti, in exchange for C Mark Graham. |
01/01/1939 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (51); Power: 26 (47); Eye: 29 (48). |
07/24/1939 |
Wins the S A EC Player of the Week Award. |
08/07/1939 |
Was selected to the 1939 Colonial League All-Star Game. |
09/30/1939 |
Wins the 1939 S A EC Most Valuable Player Award. |
11/21/1939 |
Was traded by the Cleveland Naps to the Baltimore Orioles, along with RP Jon Stoen and SP Jonathan Amos, in exchange for LF Shamar Barnes. |
01/01/1940 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (45); Power: 29 (44); Eye: 30 (45). |
01/01/1941 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (45); Power: 32 (43); Eye: 33 (44). |
06/30/1941 |
Wins the A Player of the Week Award. |
01/01/1942 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (45); Power: 36 (43); Eye: 37 (44). |
05/14/1942 |
Released by the Baltimore organization. |
06/23/1942 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Myrtle Beach Pelicans organization. |
09/23/1942 |
Wins the 1942 Pioneer League Championship Series with the South Bend Cubs! |
10/03/1942 |
Released by the Chicago organization. |
01/01/1943 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 39 (43); Power: 36 (41); Eye: 38 (43). |
10/22/1943 |
Retired from professional baseball. |