01/01/1927 |
Drafted in the 1927 inaugural draft by the Baltimore Orioles. (Round 134, Pick 6, 2001st overall pick). |
01/01/1928 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 7 (8); Power: 45 (49); Eye: 28 (31). |
01/01/1929 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 6 (7); Power: 47 (49); Eye: 28 (31). |
09/21/1929 |
Wins the 1929 Colonial League League Championship Series with the Delmarva Shorebirds! |
01/01/1930 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 7 (7); Power: 47 (49); Eye: 28 (30). |
01/01/1931 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 7 (7); Power: 47 (48); Eye: 28 (29). |
07/17/1931 |
Released by the Baltimore organization. |
08/01/1931 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Arizona Diamondbacks organization. |
11/12/1931 |
Released by the Arizona organization. |
01/01/1932 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 7 (7); Power: 46 (47); Eye: 28 (29). |
07/01/1932 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Daytona Tortugas organization. |
10/02/1932 |
Released by the Cincinnati organization. |
01/01/1933 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 7 (7); Power: 45 (46); Eye: 27 (27). |
01/01/1934 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 7 (7); Power: 45 (46); Eye: 26 (27). |
10/17/1934 |
Retired from professional baseball. |