01/01/1927 |
Drafted in the 1927 inaugural draft by the Kansas City Athletics. (Round 119, Pick 15, 1785th overall pick). |
01/01/1928 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 15 (26); Power: 29 (37); Eye: 19 (25). |
01/01/1929 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 17 (20); Power: 32 (34); Eye: 21 (22). |
01/01/1930 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 18 (19); Power: 32 (34); Eye: 21 (22). |
01/01/1931 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 18 (20); Power: 33 (35); Eye: 21 (22). |
11/20/1931 |
Released by the Kansas City organization. |
01/01/1932 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 19 (19); Power: 35 (36); Eye: 21 (21). |
06/21/1932 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Gainesville Owls organization. |
09/19/1932 |
Released by the Chicago organization. |
01/01/1933 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 18 (18); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 21 (21). |
01/01/1934 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 18 (18); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 20 (20). |
01/01/1935 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 17 (17); Power: 36 (36); Eye: 20 (20). |
10/16/1935 |
Retired from professional baseball. |