01/01/1972 |
Drafted in the 1972 inaugural draft by the Portland Lumberjacks. (Round 23, Pick 16, 544th overall pick). |
05/12/1972 |
Released by the Portland Lumberjacks. |
05/20/1972 |
Signed a minor league contract ($3,200 bonus) with the Minneapolis Blizzard organization. |
11/26/1972 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1973 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 55 (55). |
06/26/1973 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Boise Majestics organization. |
11/24/1973 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1974 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 55 (55). |
06/25/1974 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Providence Players organization. |
01/01/1975 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 55 (55). |
09/01/1975 |
Released by the Detroit Dukes. |
11/04/1975 |
Retired from professional baseball. |