01/01/1972 |
Drafted in the 1972 inaugural draft by the Boston Patriots. (Round 68, Pick 16, 1624th overall pick). |
11/02/1972 |
Released by the Boston organization. |
01/01/1973 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 30 (30); Movement: 40 (40); Control: 35 (35). |
02/12/1973 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Dallas Rustlers organization. |
11/24/1973 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
12/26/1973 |
Signed a minor league contract with majors option with the San Diego Seraphs organization. |
01/01/1974 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 35 (35); Movement: 50 (50); Control: 45 (45). |
04/08/1974 |
Released by the San Diego organization. |
04/17/1974 |
Signed a minor league contract with majors option with the Boston Patriots organization. |
05/01/1974 |
Did not elect for free agency and will remain in the Boston organization. |
10/31/1974 |
Released by the Boston organization. |
11/24/1974 |
Signed a minor league contract with majors option with the Charlotte Colonels organization. |
01/01/1975 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 35 (35); Movement: 45 (50); Control: 45 (45). |
03/03/1975 |
Released by the Charlotte organization. |
03/07/1975 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Dallas Rustlers organization. |
11/04/1975 |
Released by the Dallas organization. |
12/09/1975 |
Signed a minor league contract with majors option with the New York Aces organization. |
01/01/1976 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 35 (35); Movement: 45 (45); Control: 45 (45). |
03/01/1976 |
Released by the New York organization. |
03/12/1976 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Boston Patriots organization. |
11/02/1976 |
Released by the Boston organization. |
11/25/1976 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Minneapolis Blizzard organization. |
01/01/1977 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 35 (35); Movement: 40 (40); Control: 45 (45). |
02/28/1977 |
Released by the Minneapolis organization. |
03/19/1977 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Dallas Rustlers organization. |
11/01/1977 |
Released by the Dallas organization. |
12/07/1977 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Chicago Fire organization. |
01/01/1978 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 35 (35); Movement: 45 (45); Control: 50 (50). |
02/27/1978 |
Released by the Chicago organization. |
03/07/1978 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Boston Patriots organization. |
03/29/1978 |
Injured (cold),day-to-day for 1 day. |
11/02/1978 |
Released by the Boston organization. |
12/09/1978 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Phoenix Firebirds organization. |
01/01/1979 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 35 (35); Movement: 45 (45); Control: 50 (50). |
04/09/1979 |
Released by the Phoenix organization. |
05/02/1979 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Philadelphia Fury organization. |
10/30/1979 |
Released by the Philadelphia organization. |
11/22/1979 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Phoenix Firebirds organization. |
01/01/1980 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 35 (35); Movement: 45 (45); Control: 50 (50). |
10/13/1980 |
Retired from professional baseball. |