06/08/2013 |
Drafted by the Texas Rangers in the 1st round (30th) of the 2013 MLB June Amateur Draft from Winder-Barrow HS (Winder, GA). |
07/27/2016 |
Traded by the Texas Rangers to the Atlanta Braves for P Lucas Harrell and P Dario Alvarez. |
07/31/2019 |
Traded by the Atlanta Braves with LHP Joey Wentz to the Detroit Tigers for RHP Shane Greene. |
08/01/2020 |
Wins the IL Batter of the Month Award. |
11/20/2020 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $1,000,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2021 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (40); Power: 50 (55); Eye: 55 (55). |
11/16/2021 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $1,000,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2022 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (40); Power: 50 (55); Eye: 55 (55). |
11/26/2022 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2023 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 50 (50); Eye: 55 (55). |
02/25/2023 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Houston Astros organization. |
05/08/2023 |
Injured (Mild calf strain), day-to-day for 3 days. |
10/30/2023 |
Released by the Houston organization. |
01/01/2024 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 50 (50); Eye: 55 (55). |
01/01/2025 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 50 (50); Eye: 55 (55). |
10/31/2025 |
Retired from professional baseball. |